NH HB419 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Enrolled 04/11/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the position of house clerk.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the position of house clerk.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseEnrolled 04/11/2019
2019-04-25SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/25/2019); Senate Journal 15
2019-04-11SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12
2019-04-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/11/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 17
2019-03-28SenateHearing: 04/04/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 16
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 8
2019-02-14HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 69
2019-02-05HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/14/2019 (Vote 12-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 17
2019-01-16HouseExecutive Session: 01/30/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 3 P. 13

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback