NH HB417 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 563
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 563
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to reimbursement of fees and out-of-pocket expenses associated with estate administration.
Title
Relative to reimbursement of fees and out-of-pocket expenses associated with estate administration.
Sponsors
Rep. James Webb [R] | Rep. Katherine Prudhomme-O'Brien [R] | Rep. Joe Duarte [R] | Rep. Max Abramson [R] |
Rep. William Infantine [R] | Rep. Tammy Simmons [R] | Rep. John Martin [R] | Rep. Susan DeLemus [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 563 |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 4 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 347 |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-02-04 | House | Executive Session: 2/4/2015 12:45 PM Legislative Office Building 208=RECESSED= |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG. 222 |