NH HB414 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB414
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-156 01/06/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-156 01/06/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Relative to evacuations under a state of emergency.
Title
Relative to evacuations under a state of emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Lekas [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-06 - House - ITL (Y: 198 N: 156 NV: 39 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-156 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-16 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-11-16 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB414 11/15/2021 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 32 |
2021-10-25 | House | Executive Session: 10/25/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-08-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/07/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2021-03-23 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing: 03/01/2021 10:00 am Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/97946186413 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-02-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/01/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/97946186413 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. *The full committee work session will start at the earlier of 1:30pm or 30 minutes following the close of public hearings. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 47 |
Same As/Similar To
HB414 (Carry Over) 2021-10-25 - Executive Session: 10/25/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308