NH HB413 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 188; I. Sec. 4 Eff: 11/01/2026 II. Sec. 5-7 Eff: 10/09/2021 III. Rem. Eff: 08/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 188; I. Sec. 4 Eff: 11/01/2026 II. Sec. 5-7 Eff: 10/09/2021 III. Rem. Eff: 08/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a solid waste working group on solid waste management planning, relative to compost, and establishing a statewide solid waste disposal reduction goal.
Title
Establishing a solid waste working group on solid waste management planning, relative to compost, and establishing a statewide solid waste disposal reduction goal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 188; I. Sec. 4 Eff: 11/01/2026 II. Sec. 5-7 Eff: 10/09/2021 III. Rem. Eff: 08/10/2021 |
2021-07-23 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-07-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2060e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2060e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1241s (Rep. Pearl): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 10 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1241s, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-1241s, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1241s, 05/06/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/12/2021, 02:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0343h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 20 |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment # 2021-0343h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 20 |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0343h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 11 |
2021-02-08 | House | Public Hearing: 02/17/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link: To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97165419816 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 2 P. 47 |