NH HB411 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to equalized property valuation used to apportion expenses in cooperative school districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to equalized property valuation used to apportion expenses in cooperative school districts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 17
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/19/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 7
2019-02-21House==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-02-20House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 13

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback