NH HB411 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the payment of subminimum wages to persons with disabilities.
Title
Prohibiting the payment of subminimum wages to persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/30/15; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/23/15; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Hearing: 4/14/15, Room 100, State House, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0075h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 796 |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment #0075h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 796 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0075h for Mar 11 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 404-405 |
2015-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/10/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 12, PG. 222 |