NH HB408 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB408
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-13 - Executive Session: 10/20/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-13 - Executive Session: 10/20/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to employment restrictions for registered sex offenders.
Title
Relative to employment restrictions for registered sex offenders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-13 | House | Executive Session: 10/20/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-09-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/05/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-09-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/28/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-03-31 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-26 | House | Public Hearing: 02/26/2021 11:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92701022260 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 46 |
Same As/Similar To
HB408 (Carry Over) 2021-10-13 - Executive Session: 10/20/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203