NH HB406 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB406
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Relative to the ability of the public to observe the processing and counting of absentee ballots.
Title
Relative to the ability of the public to observe the processing and counting of absentee ballots.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB406 11/03/2021 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 8 |
2021-09-22 | House | Executive Session: 10/06/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2021-03-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2021 12:00 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/91394352757 |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing: 03/04/2021 02:15 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/91092569734Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-03 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/10/2021 10:20 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/95087806399 (if necessary) |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 46 |
Same As/Similar To
HB406 (Carry Over) 2021-09-22 - Executive Session: 10/06/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=525&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB406 |