NH HB402 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting false statements against candidates.
Title
Relative to prohibiting false statements against candidates.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Hynes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 15 |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/15/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 9 |
2023-03-08 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/15/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-02-28 | House | Public Hearing: 03/07/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-02-21 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/28/2023 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2023 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 14 |