NH HB402 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - Remove from Table (Rep. Spillane): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 182-193 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to takings of property in a declared emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to takings of property in a declared emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - House - Remove from Table (Y: 182 N: 193 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - House - OTP (Y: 166 N: 171 NV: 61 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09HouseRemove from Table (Rep. Spillane): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 182-193 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 13
2021-04-08HouseLay on Table (Rep. Osborne): Motion Adopted DV 169-168 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 112
2021-04-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 166-171 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 110
2021-03-22HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-03-22HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 52
2021-03-10HouseExecutive Session: 03/10/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95164452682
2021-03-05HousePublic Hearing: 03/05/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link: To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97676008758 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-10HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 46

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback