NH HB402 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 86
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 86
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to presumptive evidence of domicile for voters.
Title
Relative to presumptive evidence of domicile for voters.
Sponsors
Rep. David Bates [R] | Rep. Carl Seidel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 86 |
2017-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 11 |