NH HB402 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 184-74; House Journal 26, PG. 1271-1273
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 184-74; House Journal 26, PG. 1271-1273
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the Franklin Partin right-to-work act.
Title
Establishing the Franklin Partin right-to-work act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 184 N: 74 NV: 114 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 184-74; House Journal 26, PG. 1271-1273 |
2015-03-12 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep W. O'Brien); House Journal 24, PG. 766 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 404 |
2015-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-02-02 | House | Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 1:00 PM Representatives Hall |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 12, PG. 221 |