NH HB401 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Enrolled (in recess of) 06/03/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the duty of school superintendents regarding criminal history records checks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the duty of school superintendents regarding criminal history records checks.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/03/2021
2021-06-02SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/27/2021); Senate Journal 18
2021-05-06SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14
2021-04-28SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/06/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22
2021-04-07SenateRemote Hearing: 04/13/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 19
2021-04-07SenateIntroduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 11
2021-04-07HouseReconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
2021-04-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0148h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 9
2021-04-07HouseAmendment # 2021-0148h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 9
2021-03-24HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0148h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 7
2021-02-23HousePublic Hearing: 02/23/2021 12:45 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94382337363 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-10HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 46

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback