NH HB401 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB401
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-31 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-31 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the implementation of the recommendations of grid modernization.
Title
Relative to the implementation of the recommendations of grid modernization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-31 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-18 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 10/25/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-10-18 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 10/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-10-12 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 10/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-09-28 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2017 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-09-13 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/28/2017 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-07-31 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/06/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-02-21 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-02-15 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 11 |
Same As/Similar To
HB401 (Carry Over) 2017-10-31 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar)