NH HB399 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1948s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to annulment of arrests or convictions for possession of a certain quantity of marijuana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to annulment of arrests or convictions for possession of a certain quantity of marijuana.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1948s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
2019-03-28SenateHearing: 04/02/2019, Room 100, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 16
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 8
2019-01-31HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 12
2019-01-22HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/31/2019 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 7
2019-01-09HouseExecutive Session: 01/17/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/15/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 13

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback