NH HB399 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 211; Eff: 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 211; Eff: 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to annulment of arrests or convictions for possession of a certain quantity of marijuana.
Title
Relative to annulment of arrests or convictions for possession of a certain quantity of marijuana.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. David Welch [R] | Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Sherry Frost [D] |
Rep. Timothy Josephson [D] | Rep. Charlotte DiLorenzo [D] | Rep. Larry Gagne [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 211; Eff: 01/01/2020 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1948s (Rep. Cushing): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 2 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1948s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1948s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1948s, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1948s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2019, Room 100, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-01-31 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 12 |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/31/2019 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 7 |
2019-01-09 | House | Executive Session: 01/17/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 13 |