NH HB396 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB396
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-11-15 - Committee Report: Without Recommendation 11/08/2023 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-11-15 - Committee Report: Without Recommendation 11/08/2023 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to state recognition of biological sex.
Title
Relative to state recognition of biological sex.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-15 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 11/08/2023 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) |
2023-09-26 | House | Executive Session: 11/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39 |
2023-09-22 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 11/15/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39 |
2023-09-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39 |
2023-09-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/18/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 37 |
2023-05-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/07/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-02-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/09/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2023 04:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 14 |
Same As/Similar To
HB396 (Carry Over) 2023-11-15 - Committee Report: Without Recommendation 11/08/2023 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar)