NH HB396 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 208
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Jan 23 @ 11:30 am in Legislative Office Building 208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to delay or denial of records under the right-to-know law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to delay or denial of records under the right-to-know law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-01-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Judiciary

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback