NH HB396 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Enrolled 05/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to delay or denial of records under the right-to-know law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to delay or denial of records under the right-to-know law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseEnrolled 05/08/2019
2019-05-16SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17
2019-05-03HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2019-1507s (Rep. M. Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019
2019-04-25SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1507s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/25/2019; Senate Journal 14
2019-04-25SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1507s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/25/2019; Senate Journal 14
2019-04-17SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1507s, 04/25/2019; Senate Calendar 19
2019-03-28SenateHearing: 04/02/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 16
2019-03-25SenateIntroduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-14HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 8
2019-03-06HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/14/2019 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 4
2019-02-12HouseExecutive Session: 03/05/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-01-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 12

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback