NH HB395 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 203-141 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 203-141 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to number plates for motor vehicles.
Title
Relative to number plates for motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Prout [R] | Rep. Casey Conley [D] | Rep. Peter Torosian [R] | Rep. Mark Warden [R] |
Rep. Alicia Lekas [R] | Rep. Tony Lekas [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - ITL (Y: 203 N: 141 NV: 27 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 203-141 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 48 |
2019-03-14 | House | Special Order to 03/19/2019 (Rep. Conley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 43 |
2019-03-07 | House | Special Order to 03/14/2019 Without Objection House Journal 8 P. 60 |
2019-02-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2019-02-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/07/2019 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 20 |
2019-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 12 |