NH HB393 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting a motor vehicle operator to use only a rear license plate.
Title
Permitting a motor vehicle operator to use only a rear license plate.
Sponsors
Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB393-FN 01/31/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 11 |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 01/31/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 14 |