NH HB393 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB393
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-09 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-09 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Winnipesaukee river basin control program reserve account.
Title
Relative to the Winnipesaukee river basin control program reserve account.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-09 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-09-28 | House | Executive Session: 10/18/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-08-30 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/13/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-02-07 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/01/2017 Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 3 P. 12 |
Same As/Similar To
HB393 (Carry Over) 2017-11-09 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar)