NH HB393 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 01/01/2014; Chapter 0042
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 01/01/2014; Chapter 0042
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to effluent limitations with regard to nitrogen and phosphorus.
Title
Relative to effluent limitations with regard to nitrogen and phosphorus.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 01/01/2014; Chapter 0042 |
2013-05-08 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.1424 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/2/13; Senate Calendar 18 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 4/10/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy & Natural Resources |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0561h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.767-768 |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment #0561h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.767-768 |
2013-02-28 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0561h; House Calendar 22, PG.547 |
2013-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0561h for Mar 13 (Vote 17-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.511 |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/26/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 10:15 Amendment)== |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/7/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 1/30/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 12, PG.194 |