NH HB388 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-181 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to number plates for motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to number plates for motor vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-14 - House - ITL (Y: 191 N: 181 NV: 11 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - ITL (Y: 191 N: 181 NV: 11 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-14HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-181 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 38
2023-02-07HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2023-02-07HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB388-FN 01/31/2023 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 16
2023-01-25HouseExecutive Session: 01/31/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203
2023-01-25HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203
2023-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 13

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback