NH HB386 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/02/2017; Chapter 63; Eff. 8/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/02/2017; Chapter 63; Eff. 8/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to technical corrections to the education tax credit statute.
Title
Relative to technical corrections to the education tax credit statute.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/02/2017; Chapter 63; Eff. 8/1/2017 |
2017-05-03 | House | Enrolled 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 26 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/27/2017); Senate Journal 16 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 17Y-6N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/20/2017; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing: 04/05/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced 03/23/2017 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2017 House Journal 11 P. 7 |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/23/2017 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 4 |
2017-03-15 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2017 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/07/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 26 |
2017-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 26 |
2017-02-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-02-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/15/2017 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 17 |
2017-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 02/01/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2017 10:50 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 12 |