NH HB380 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-07 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/26/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-07 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/26/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Summary
Relative to long-term care.
Title
Relative to long-term care.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Donovan [D] | Sen. Michael Downing [R] | Rep. Larry Emerton [R] | Rep. Raymond Gagnon [D] |
Sen. John Gallus [R] | Sen. Theodore Gatsas [R] | Rep. James Pilliod [R] | Sen. Margaret Wood Hassan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-07 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/26/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2010-07-12 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/3/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2010-03-17 | House Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs for Interim Study; House Journal 26, PG.1365 | |
2010-01-13 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 9, PG.443 | |
2010-01-06 | House Special Ordered to Next Session Date; House Journal 6, PG.310 | |
2010-01-06 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Vaillancourt); House Journal 6, PG.250 | |
2009-11-12 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 6 Consent Calendar (vote 14-0); House Calendar 2, PG.82 | |
2009-10-13 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/10/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2009-09-29 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/30/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2009-03-18 | House Retained in Committee | |
2009-03-12 | House Executive Session: 3/18/2009 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2009-03-12 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/16/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2009-03-04 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/12/2009 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2009-02-11 | House Public Hearing: 2/19/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2009-01-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.225 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=708&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |