NH HB377 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.707
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.707
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring daily physical education for public school pupils.
Title
Requiring daily physical education for public school pupils.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Cox [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.707 | |
2011-03-08 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 15 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.527 | |
2011-02-18 | House Executive Session: 3/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 3/1/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205-207 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Education; House Journal 11, PG. 184 |