NH HB375 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/23/2021; Chapter 140; Eff: 09/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allowing the destruction of valueless contraband by the chief of police, the chief's designee, the county sheriff, or the sheriff's designee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing the destruction of valueless contraband by the chief of police, the chief's designee, the county sheriff, or the sheriff's designee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1165s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-26HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/23/2021; Chapter 140; Eff: 09/21/2021
2021-07-12HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021
2021-07-12SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-06-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1165s (Rep. Abbas): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 4
2021-04-22SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-1165s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/22/2021; Senate Journal 12
2021-04-22SenateSen. Gannon Floor Amendment # 2021-1165s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 04/22/2021; Senate Journal 12
2021-04-22SenateSen. Gannon Moved to Remove HB375 from the Consent Calendar; 04/22/2021; Senate Journal 12
2021-04-15SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/22/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20
2021-03-17SenateRemote Hearing: 03/23/2021, 02:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 16
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7
2021-02-24HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 5
2021-02-15HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 3
2021-01-28HousePublic Hearing: 02/08/2021 11:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95686681680 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-10HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 45

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback