NH HB374 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 236-139 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 236-139 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting certain state officers from forming political action committees.
Title
Prohibiting certain state officers from forming political action committees.
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Gidge [D] | Rep. Katherine Prudhomme-O'Brien [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. David Love [R] |
Rep. Gregory Hill [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - ITL (Y: 236 N: 139 NV: 8 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 236-139 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 30 |
2019-02-06 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2019-02-06 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/14/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 14 |
2019-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 12 |