NH HB374 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 08/03/2013; Chapter 0040
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 08/03/2013; Chapter 0040
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to electric utility investment in distributed energy resources.
Title
Relative to electric utility investment in distributed energy resources.
Sponsors
Rep. Ian Raymond [D] | Rep. Lisa DiMartino [D] | Rep. James Devine [R] | Rep. Suzanne Smith [D] |
Sen. Andrew Hosmer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 08/03/2013; Chapter 0040 |
2013-05-08 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.1424 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 5/2/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 4/3/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy & Natural Resources |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0707h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.768-769 |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment #0707h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.768-769 |
2013-03-06 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0707h; House Calendar 22, PG.545-546 |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0707h for Mar 13 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.512 |
2013-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-02-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 3/5/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/14/2013 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 12, PG.193 |