NH HB374 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 15, Pg.310
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 15, Pg.310
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Banning corn-based ethanol as an additive to gasoline sold in New Hampshire.
Title
Banning corn-based ethanol as an additive to gasoline sold in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Rep. David Campbell [D] | Rep. Gene Chandler [R] | Rep. Beatriz Pastor-Bodmer [D] | Rep. Joseph Pitre [R] |
Rep. Charles Townsend [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - House - ITL (Y: 87 N: 237 NV: 74 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 15, Pg.310 | |
2011-04-28 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 5/4/11; Senate Calendar 22 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Hearing: 4/28/11, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 21 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 12, Pg.243 | |
2011-03-16 | House Ought to Pass (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.923-926 | |
2011-03-16 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 87-237; House Journal 28, PG.923-926 | |
2011-03-02 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 22, PG.564 | |
2011-03-02 | House Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 15 (Vote 10-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.564 | |
2011-03-02 | House Executive Session: 3/2/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-02-15 | House Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 11:25 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-02-09 | House Vacated from Commerce and Consumer Affairs and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 16, PG.308 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 184 |