NH HB371 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 194-157; House Journal 16, PG. 314-316
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 194-157; House Journal 16, PG. 314-316
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to assessing the consequences of the Citizens United decision.
Title
Relative to assessing the consequences of the Citizens United decision.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Elliott [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Mary Cooney [D] | Rep. Peter Bixby [D] |
Rep. Lars Christiansen [R] | Rep. David Kidder [R] | Rep. James Grenier [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 194 N: 157 NV: 13 Abs: 34) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 194-157; House Journal 16, PG. 314-316 |
2015-02-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2015-02-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 11 (Vote 5-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar11, PG. 181-182 |
2015-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 2/4/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2015 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Legislative Administration; House Journal 12, PG. 220 |