NH HB37 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/12/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303
Pending: House Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/12/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303
Pending: House Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study best practices for companion animal groomers.
Title
Establishing a committee to study best practices for companion animal groomers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/12/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-03-01 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-02-02 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Environment and Agriculture |