NH HB368 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Executive Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95501229688
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to claims for medical monitoring.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to claims for medical monitoring.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02HouseExecutive Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95501229688
2021-03-02HouseExecutive Session: 03/02/2021 9:00 a.m. Members of the public may attend using the following links: 1. To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95501229688 2. Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-929-205-6099 3. Webinar ID: 955 0122 9688 The following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: hcs@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3600).
2021-02-16HousePublic Hearing: 02/16/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94907543326 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 45

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback