NH HB366 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Retained in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Adding opioid addiction, misuse, and abuse to qualifying medical conditions under therapeutic use of cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adding opioid addiction, misuse, and abuse to qualifying medical conditions under therapeutic use of cannabis.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-20House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-20HouseDivision I Subcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104
2019-01-31HouseDivision I Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212
2019-01-30House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/07/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-10HousePublic Hearing: 01/15/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 11

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback