NH HB364 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB364
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-21 - ==RESCHEDULED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-21 - ==RESCHEDULED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding the definition of charitable organization to include fraternal organizations for the purposes of holding raffles.
Title
Expanding the definition of charitable organization to include fraternal organizations for the purposes of holding raffles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-21 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-09-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/28/2021 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2021-09-08 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 104 |
2021-08-18 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-08-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/07/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-09 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/03/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92309184005 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-02-18 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94528213728 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/11/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99381153388 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 45 |
Same As/Similar To
HB364 (Carry Over) 2021-09-21 - ==RESCHEDULED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.