NH HB364 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall HB 364 Become Law: Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall HB 364 Become Law: Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting qualifying patients and designated caregivers to cultivate cannabis for therapeutic use and permitting qualifying patients and designated caregivers to donate excess cannabis to other qualifying patients.
Title
Permitting qualifying patients and designated caregivers to cultivate cannabis for therapeutic use and permitting qualifying patients and designated caregivers to donate excess cannabis to other qualifying patients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-19 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - Veto Override (Y: 259 N: 120 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - Veto Override (Y: 259 N: 120 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall HB 364 Become Law: Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22 |
2019-09-18 | House | Veto Overridden 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 259-120 by Required Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 21 P. 26 |
2019-08-05 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 08/02/2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2654e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 54 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2654e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1613s and 1783s (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 9 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2019-1613s, and 2019-1783s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2019-1783s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1613s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1613s, 05/02/2019; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing: 03/26/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0689h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 40 |
2019-03-07 | House | Amendment # 2019-0689h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 40 |
2019-02-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0689h for 03/07/2019 (Vote 17-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 12 |
2019-02-20 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-02-20 | House | Division I Subcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2019-01-31 | House | Division I Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-01-30 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/07/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 11 |