NH HB364 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permitting qualifying patients and designated caregivers to cultivate cannabis for therapeutic use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permitting qualifying patients and designated caregivers to cultivate cannabis for therapeutic use.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-10HousePublic Hearing: 01/15/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback