NH HB364 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 241; Eff. 9/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 241; Eff. 9/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to accidents involving youth operators of motor vehicles.
Title
Relative to accidents involving youth operators of motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 241; Eff. 9/16/2017 |
2017-07-05 | House | Enrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 27 |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-22 | House | Conference Committee Report 2308c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 21 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2017-2308c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/22/2017; Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, #2017-2308c; 06/15/2017 |
2017-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/13/2017 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Birdsell, Gannon, Watters; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-01 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Steven Smith, T. Walsh, Horn, Sykes 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 4 |
2017-06-01 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1338s and Requests CofC (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 4 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1338s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/06/2017; Senate Journal 13 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Floor Amendment #2017-1338s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/06/2017; Senate Journal 13 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved to Remove HB 364 from the Consent Calendar; 04/06/2017; Senate Journal 13 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/06/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/28/2017, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:20 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0134h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 52 |
2017-03-09 | House | Amendment #2017-0134h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 52 |
2017-03-02 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-03-02 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0134h for 03/08/2017 (Vote 11-3; Regular Calendar) |
2017-03-02 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2017 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/22/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 10 |