NH HB363 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB363
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-24 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2755h (Vote 9-3; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-24 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2755h (Vote 9-3; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Including the legislature as a public employer under the public employee labor relations act and relative to the duties of the joint committee on legislative facilities.
Title
Including the legislature as a public employer under the public employee labor relations act and relative to the duties of the joint committee on legislative facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2755h (Vote 9-3; Regular Calendar) |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 10/22/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-09-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-02-20 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-29 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 3 P. 11 |
Same As/Similar To
HB363 (Carry Over) 2019-10-24 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2755h (Vote 9-3; Regular Calendar)