NH HB36 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/04/2023; Chapter 10; eff: 07/03/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/04/2023; Chapter 10; eff: 07/03/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to fees of sheriffs and deputy sheriffs.
Title
Relative to fees of sheriffs and deputy sheriffs.
Sponsors
Rep. Sallie Fellows [D] | Rep. Douglas Trottier [R] | Rep. Dianne Schuett [D] | Rep. Jennifer Rhodes [R] |
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/04/2023; Chapter 10; eff: 07/03/2023 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 04/13/2023); Senate Journal 14 |
2023-05-02 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 04/06/2023 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/13/2023; Senate Journal 13 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/13/2023; Senate Calendar 17 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/28/2023, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0026h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2023 House Journal 4 |
2023-02-02 | House | Amendment # 2023-0026h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2023 House Journal 4 |
2023-01-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0026h 01/25/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 4 |
2023-01-11 | House | Executive Session: 01/19/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2023 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Municipal and County Government |