NH HB357 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Conference Committee Report, Not Signed Off
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Conference Committee Report, Not Signed Off
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting an employer from using credit history in employment decisions.
Title
Prohibiting an employer from using credit history in employment decisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment Sections 2,3, & 4 (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment Section 1 (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment 1999s (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - OTP/AM 0932H (Y: 213 N: 144 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment Section 1 (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment 1999s (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - OTP/AM 0932H (Y: 213 N: 144 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | Conference Committee Report, Not Signed Off |
2013-06-13 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/18/2013 9:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Sanborn, Hosmer |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved Accede to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-11 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps A.White, Weed, Ley, and Cahill [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1649-1650 |
2013-06-11 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1999s(NT) and Requests C of C (Rep Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1649-1650 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1999s, New Title, Sections 2, 3, 4 and 5, Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1999s, New Title, Sections 1 and 5, Regular Calendar 20Y-4N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg |
2013-06-06 | Senate | The Chair Ruled the Question Divisible: Section 1 and Sections 2, 3 & 4 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Moved to Divide the Question: Section 1 and Sections 2, 3 & 4 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2013-1999s, New Title, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Amendment Adopted |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sen. Bradley moved Ought to Pass |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Without Objection, HB 357 is Special Ordered to the end of the Regular Calendar, 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 6/6/13; Senate Calendar 23 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Without Objection, HB 357 is Special Ordered to the Next Session Day, 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 5/30/13; Senate Calendar 22 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Without Objection, HB 357 is Special Ordered to the Next Session Day, 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Hearing: === ROOM CHANGE === 4/9/13, Room 100, State House, 1:20 p.m. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 4/9/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce |
2013-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0932h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 213-144; House Journal 27, PG.879-882 |
2013-03-20 | House | Floor Amendment #2013-0932h (Rep A.White): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 27, PG.879-880 |
2013-03-20 | House | Lay on Table (Rep Elliott): Motion Failed Division Vote 130-219; House Journal 27, PG.879 |
2013-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass (Rep A.White); House Journal 27, PG.879 |
2013-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation for Mar 20, Regular Calendar Part II; House Calendar 23 PG.594 |
2013-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-02-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 2/28/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 12, PG.192 |