NH HB356 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Enrolled Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted, (In recess of 05/06/2021); Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the city of Manchester employees' contributory retirement system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the city of Manchester employees' contributory retirement system.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06SenateEnrolled Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted, (In recess of 05/06/2021); Senate Journal 15
2021-05-06HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021
2021-04-22HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-1140e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 04/09/2021
2021-04-16SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-1140e Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted, (In recess of 04/08/2021); Senate Journal 12
2021-04-08SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/08/2021; Senate Journal 11
2021-03-31SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/08/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18
2021-03-17SenateRemote Hearing: 03/24/2021, 09:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 16
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7
2021-02-24HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 8
2021-02-09HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 6
2021-01-21HousePublic Hearing: 02/01/2021 01:05 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/94106022547 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from thetime the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 44

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback