NH HB354 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB354
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/14/2024; Chapter 47; eff. 7/1/2024 House Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/14/2024; Chapter 47; eff. 7/1/2024 House Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to chartered public school eligibility for state school building aid.
Title
Relative to chartered public school eligibility for state school building aid.
Sponsors
Rep. Maureen Mooney [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Deborah Hobson [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] |
Rep. Gerald Griffin [R] | Rep. Bob Healey [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-03 - House - OTPA (Y: 190 N: 177 NV: 15 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-20 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/14/2024; Chapter 47; eff. 7/1/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-06-10 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/30/2024 House Journal 15 P. 36 |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/30/2024); Senate Journal 17 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024, Vote 3-2; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Hearing: 03/12/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 5 |
2024-01-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-2415h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 190-177 01/04/2024 House Journal 1 P. 100 |
2024-01-04 | House | Amendment # 2023-2415h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 98 |
2023-11-17 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 11/13/2023 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 27 |
2023-10-25 | House | Full Work Session: 10/31/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 43 |
2023-10-10 | House | Executive Session: 11/13/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 41 |
2023-10-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/18/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 41 |
2023-09-25 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/05/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 39 |
2023-09-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-08-22 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-08-09 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/07/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-06-01 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 06/12/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-05-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/30/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-03-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/15/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 02/15/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2023 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 12 |
Same As/Similar To
HB354 (Carry Over) 2023-09-25 - Full Committee Work Session: 10/05/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 39