NH HB353 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB353
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-08 - ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/15/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-08 - ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/15/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a credit under RSA 77 for tax paid on income subject to taxation in another state.
Title
Establishing a credit under RSA 77 for tax paid on income subject to taxation in another state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-08 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/15/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-08-18 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-08-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/07/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-09 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/03/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92309184005 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-02-18 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94528213728 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92120368845 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 44 |
Same As/Similar To
HB353 (Carry Over) 2021-09-08 - ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/15/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204