NH HB349 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB349
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to certification requirements for school nurses.
Title
Relative to certification requirements for school nurses.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Hill [R] | Rep. Steven Smith [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] |
Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Alicia Lekas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1 |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 01/05/2022; Senate Calendar 49 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 16 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/20/2021; Senate Calendar 24A |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/23/2021, 09:45 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-02-25 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Baldasaro): Motion Failed Voice Vote 02/25/2021 House Journal 4 P. 27 |
2021-02-25 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 201-146 02/25/2021 House Journal 4 P. 25 |
2021-02-18 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-02-18 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 27 |
2021-02-03 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98073405784 |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/02/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99800820017 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 44 |
Same As/Similar To
HB349 (Carry Over) 2021-10-18 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate