NH HB347 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB347
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-21 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 10-6; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-21 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 10-6; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation for rural bus service.
Title
Making an appropriation for rural bus service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-21 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 10-6; Regular Calendar) |
2017-09-21 | House | Executive Session: 09/21/2017 Legislative Office Building 201 |
2017-09-13 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2017-02-01 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/01/2017 Legislative Office Building 201 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2017 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 3 P. 11 |
Same As/Similar To
HB347 (Carry Over) 2017-09-21 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 10-6; Regular Calendar)