NH HB345 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB345
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-26 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-26 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enabling ranked-choice voting for state party primary elections and municipal elections.
Title
Enabling ranked-choice voting for state party primary elections and municipal elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-26 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-01-18 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2023 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 12 |
Same As/Similar To
HB345 (Carry Over) 2023-01-26 - Retained in Committee