NH HB343 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB343
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to billing for ambulance services.
Title
Relative to billing for ambulance services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-10-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/12/2021 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2021-08-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/21/2021 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-03-23 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/10/2021 01:45 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95521072179 |
2021-01-26 | House | Public Hearing: 02/02/2021 02:15 pm Members of the public may attend using the following links:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92235067141 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 44 |
Same As/Similar To
HB343 (Carry Over) 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308