NH HB330 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/09/2021; Chapter 108; Eff: 09/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/09/2021; Chapter 108; Eff: 09/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to sports book locations.
Title
Relative to sports book locations.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Rep. Scott Wallace [R] | Rep. Mike Bordes [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] |
Rep. Michael Moffett [R] | Rep. Cody Belanger [R] | Rep. Tony Lekas [R] | Rep. Douglas Trottier [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/09/2021; Chapter 108; Eff: 09/07/2021 |
2021-07-07 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-24 | House | Conference Committee Report 2021-1981c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2021-1981c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/24/2021; Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2021-1981c; 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-15 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/15/2021 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-06-14 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Janigian Replaces Rep. Doucette 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 22 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Giuda, French, D'Allesandro; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-07 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1126s and Requests CofC (Reps. Abrami, Doucette, Bershtein, Ames): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 52 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1126s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/22/2021; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-1126s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 04/22/2021; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1126s, 04/22/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/12/2021, 09:15 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0314h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 21 |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment # 2021-0314h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 21 |
2021-02-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0314h (Vote 24-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 14 |
2021-02-04 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/10/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99928276230 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/04/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95843569442 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 43 |